Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members
Sponsored by
Delegate Reilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the appointed members of the Harford County Board of Education to be appointed within 90 days of the general election beginning in November 2024; and providing for the termination of the terms of certain appointed members of the county board.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0382
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Harford County - Board of Education - Terms of Appointed Members
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 3:56 PM
Click to return on the top page