Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga and Kittleman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual to take a certain civics test, and achieve a passing score by correctly answering at least 60% of the questions, in order to, on or after January 1, 2022, graduate from a public high school, meet certain alternative requirements for obtaining a Maryland high school diploma, or qualify for a Maryland high school diploma by examination; requiring the State Board of Education to determine the means of providing each high school student an opportunity to take the required civics test; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0834 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.5 )
(   11-807, 11-808 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:43 PM