Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Small Businesses and Minority Businesses – Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Carey, W. Fisher, Ivey, Luedtke, Washington, Wilkins, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of General Services, the Secretary of Transportation, the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland, and the President of Morgan State University to adopt certain regulations by December 31, 2019, to require the qualification of a business as a small business under certain circumstances; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations providing for the certification of a business as a minority business enterprise under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0983
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0224 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296585/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement – Small Businesses and Minority Businesses – Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {296585/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Procurement – Small Businesses and Minority Businesses – Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {344631/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Procurement – Small Businesses and Minority Businesses – Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Text - Chapter - Procurement – Small Businesses and Minority Businesses – Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM