Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0285


CH0152

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 152
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to publish a meeting agenda not less than 1 week before a meeting; requiring the Board to broadcast via live stream every open meeting online; altering the timing requirement for publication of meeting minutes to not later than 1 month after a meeting; and requiring the Board to archive and store recordings of each open meeting for not less than 3 years and records of minutes for each open meeting for not less than 7 years.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0163
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473991/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924732/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 152
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {473991/1 Adopted 38
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {924732/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board Meetings
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 152
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:12 PM