Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Carr, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Guyton, Hettleman, Kelly, R. Lewis, Love, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, to the extent practicable, certain stakeholders convened under the Maternal Mortality Review Program reflect the racial and ethnic diversity of women most impacted by maternal deaths in the State.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/5/2020 4:24 PM