Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann, Beidle, Glenn, and Lafferty
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a common ownership community to foreclose on a lien against a unit owner or lot owner only if the damages secured by the lien consist solely of delinquent periodic or special assessments and reasonable costs and attorney's fees directly related to the filing of the lien and not exceeding the amount of the delinquent assessments and do not include fines or attorney's fees related to recovering the fines; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {270913/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {680118/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-9)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Delegates Niemann, Beidle, and Norman
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senators Muse, Zirkin, and Shank
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {270913/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {680118/1 Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {558574/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-9) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Delegates Niemann, Beidle, and Norman 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senators Muse, Zirkin, and Shank 62
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM