Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons and Revocation of Advance Directives
Sponsored by
Delegate Morhaim
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to appoint a guardian of the person of a disabled person for a limited period of time under specified circumstances; specifying that specified rights, duties, and powers that a court may order include the duty to file a specified report; authorizing a declarant to waive specified rights when making an advance directive; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0090
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {376381/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {588573/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {376381/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {588573/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM