Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in organized contests that have the objective of killing a coyote, fox, or raccoon for prizes or monetary awards; establishing a $25 fine for each coyote, fox, or raccoon killed in violation of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0200
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0863 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/01/2020
Legislative Date
8/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-24)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/01/2020 8/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (105-24) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:59 PM
Click to return on the top page