Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Ali, Anderson, Dumais, Ebersole, Gibson, Lam, J. Lewis, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Proctor, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Awarding a one-time diminution credit to reduce the term of confinement of an inmate if the inmate successfully obtains a certain educational certificate, diploma, or degree; establishing a diminution credit of not less than 60 days and not more than 730 days that may be awarded; and requiring the Commissioner of Correction to establish a uniform system of deductions and participation criteria for awarding a certain diminution credit.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1113
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM