Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, D. Barnes, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, and Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a nonpublic elementary or secondary school that receives State funds from refusing enrollment of, expelling, withholding privileges from, or discriminating against any student or prospective student because of an individual's race, color, religion, sex, age, national origin, marital status, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability; prohibiting such a school that receives State funds from taking retaliatory action against a student or parent or guardian who files a complaint alleging discrimination; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0848
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1565 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {955860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-47)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {955860/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (93-47) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-601 through 26-603 )
(   20-1001, 20-1006, 20-1007, 20-1009, 20-101, 20-1012, 20-1013, 20-1017, 20-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM