Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Ali, Barkley, Beidle, Buckel, Chang, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, C. Howard, Kaiser, Kipke, Kramer, Luedtke, Patterson, Reilly, Rosenberg, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, Afzali, D. Barnes, Hornberger, Jalisi, Long, Mosby, Rose, Simonaire, Walker, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under certain circumstances for a certain amount of retirement income attributable to certain employment as a correctional officer; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {995769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {989134/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {863225/2 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {995769/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {989134/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Floor Amendment {863225/2 (Senator Peters) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM