Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Sponsored by
Delegates Busch, Bagnall, Barve, Branch, Cain, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jones, Lafferty, Luedtke, McIntosh, Stein, and Wilkins
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a network of oyster sanctuaries in the five tributaries identified by the Department of Natural Resources for large-scale restoration pursuant to the 2014 Chesapeake Bay Watershed Agreement; codifying the boundaries of certain oyster sanctuaries; prohibiting a person from catching oysters in or removing oysters from a certain oyster sanctuary, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to provide reports on certain restoration plans to certain committees of the General Assembly by certain dates; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0448
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {410714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {753322/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-94)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {733622/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-96)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {773323/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-95)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {783122/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (23-109)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {863128/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-92)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {733527/1 (Senator Eckardt)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {733527/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Overridden (96-43)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Overridden (29-16)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {410714/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 44
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Floor Amendment {753322/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-94) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Floor Amendment {733622/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-96) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Floor Amendment {773323/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-95) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Floor Amendment {783122/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (23-109) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Floor Amendment {863128/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-92) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Floor Amendment {733527/1 (Senator Eckardt) 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Floor Amendment {733527/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) 53
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Overridden (96-43) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Overridden (29-16) 63
Post Passage 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
Text - Chapter - Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1014, 4-1014 through 4-1014.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM