Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Anderson, Barron, Boyce, Bridges, Charles, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ivey, Jalisi, Lafferty, Love, Stewart, Wells, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date on provisions of law related to policy and reporting requirements for race-based traffic stops; requiring the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center, on or before September 1 each year, to post on its website, in a manner easily accessible to the public, a filterable data display showing certain traffic stop data for the previous calendar year; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide electronic and written notice to the General Assembly when the filterable data display is updated.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0417
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
19
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {180610/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {133422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {133422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Ethnicity-Based or Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 19
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {180610/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {448576/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 60
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Love and Bridges) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West) 62A
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Refuses Recede 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Carter, Washington and West) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {133422/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {133422/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM