Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Kerr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Made Promotion Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to develop and promote the use of a "Maryland Made" logo to promote alcoholic beverages that are produced using ingredients grown in the State; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; authorizing the Department to establish an application process and charge a fee for the use of a certain logo; requiring a certain fee to be paid into the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-2001, 2-2002 )
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 4:15 PM