Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Acevero, Anderson, Atterbeary, Bagnall, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Boyce, Bridges, Brooks, Carey, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Conaway, D.E. Davis, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gaines, Glenn, Harrison, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Howard, Ivey, Jackson, Kipke, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Malone, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Proctor, Queen, Rogers, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Smith, Stein, Sydnor, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, R. Watson, Wells, Wilkins, Cox, Cardin, Lopez, Crutchfield, McComas, and Arikan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission; authorizing the staff member provided by the Office of the Attorney General to issue certain subpoenas; requiring the Commission to hold certain public meetings in each county where a lynching of an African American by a white mob has been documented; authorizing the Commission to research cases of racially motivated lynching; requiring the Commission to submit an interim and final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before certain dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {802419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {802419/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Text - Chapter - Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM