Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "technology-based business" to include a technology-based nonprofit organization exempt from taxation under § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code for purposes of the Maryland Technology Internship Program; and altering from 3.0 to 2.5 the cumulative grade point average that a certain individual must maintain or have maintained during a certain academic year to qualify for participation in the Maryland Technology Internship Program.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0079 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/09/2020
Legislative Date
7/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/09/2020 7/09/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/20/2021 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page