Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Arikan, and Ciliberti
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Court Dog and Child Witness Program to provide a facility dog or therapy dog to a child witness in any circuit court proceeding or other related court process, meeting, or interview; providing participation in the Program by a circuit court is voluntary; requiring participating courts to adhere to the procedures adopted by the Administrative Office of the Courts; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop a plan to implement the Program and ensure the details are publicly available; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0101
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {412219/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {412219/1 Adopted 25
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2016, 2017, 2019 )
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 11:30 AM