Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-BW Licenses MC 9-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that, in Montgomery County, the maximum number of specified licenses a person may hold may include one or more Class H-BW licenses and may not include more than one Class BD-BWL License.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-BW Licenses MC 9-17
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-BW Licenses MC 9-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-BW Licenses MC 9-17
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-BW Licenses MC 9-17
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-BW Licenses MC 9-17
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-102, 25-1613, 25-1614 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM