Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Barve)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of certain cooperative housing corporations in the State to have a reserve study conducted of the common elements of the cooperative housing corporation by a certain date and at certain intervals under certain circumstances; requiring the reserve study conducted of the common elements of a cooperative housing corporation to meet certain criteria; requiring the annual budget of a cooperative housing corporation to include certain information under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/12/2020
Legislative Date
8/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {230014/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Krebs)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Krebs) Withdrawn
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 8/12/2020 8/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {230014/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Krebs) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Krebs) Withdrawn 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Barve) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:41 AM
Click to return on the top page