Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga and Kelly
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the State income tax rates imposed on married couples filing a joint income tax return and for specified individuals with income between $150,000 and $500,000; increasing the amount allowed as a deduction for specified exemptions for married couples and specified individuals to twice the amount allowed as a deduction for specified individuals; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-105, 10-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page