Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland – Textbooks – Availability of Free or Low–Cost Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Barron, Boyce, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Hettleman, Kerr, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Terrasa, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each constituent institution of higher education in the University System of Maryland to develop a method to clearly and conspicuously show students in the online course catalog which courses use free or low cost digital materials and may provide access to certain low-cost print materials; and providing that certain free or low-cost digital materials include certain resources and be equally accessible and usable by individuals with disabilities.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0667
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694868/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Textbooks - Availability of Free Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020)
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {694868/1 Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - University System of Maryland – Textbooks – Availability of Free or Low–Cost Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020)
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-114.2 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:23 AM