Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that changing facilities suitable for changing the diaper of a child and providing personal care for an adult be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings by October 1, 2022; requiring certain entities to report to 2-1-1 Maryland, Inc., the location of changing facilities when changing facilities are installed; requiring 2-1-1 to maintain a list of changing facilities on its website; requiring the Board of Publics Works to adopt certain standards; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0061
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0010 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/17/2020
Legislative Date
7/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/17/2020 7/17/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:57 PM