Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill and Feldmark
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain restriction on use from imposing unreasonable limitations on low-impact landscaping such as rain gardens, pollinator gardens and xeriscaping; providing that "unreasonable limitations" includes items that increase the cost and efficiency of the low-impact program; providing that the Act may not be construed to prohibit a certain restriction on use from including certain reasonable guidelines; and exempting a certain restriction on use on certain historic properties; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0279 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 10:31 AM