Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying certain sexual harassment prevention training requirements to all units in the Executive, Judicial, and Legislative branches of State government and to each constituent institution of the University System of Maryland; and repealing the requirement that a certain representative designated by a unit of the University System of Maryland to coordinate certain sexual harassment prevention training be the unit's Title IX Coordinator.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0961
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {954161/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 2:55 PM