Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Financial Aid Reductions - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Hettleman, Lierman, Stein, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public senior and private nonprofit higher education institutions, within 30 days after a student's acceptance and before reducing a student's institutional gift aid, to provide certain students with notice of whether additional gift aid may result in a reduction of institutional gift aid and how much additional gift aid the student may accept before the institutional gift aid will be reduced; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0936 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Financial Aid Reductions - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Financial Aid Reductions - Notice
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-121, 18-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM