Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Montgomery County Council and the Prince George's County Council to grant an exemption from a system development charge imposed by the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission under specified circumstances for specified properties that are exempt from federal taxation and the primary mission and purpose of which are to provide programs and services to youth, for properties that are primarily used for child care or after-school care, or for properties primarily used for programs and services for developmentally disabled persons; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530711/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464132/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Committee Amendment {464132/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {530711/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {464132/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Committee Amendment {464132/1 Withdrawn 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text - Chapter - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM