Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arikan, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Howard, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Pippy, Reilly, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority, on approval by the Board of Public Works, to issue bonds to finance the construction of or improvements to certain public school facilities; establishing the Building Opportunity Financing Fund and the Building Opportunity Facilities Fund; exempting certain public school construction projects that use alternative financing methods from certain requirements; expanding certain provisions relating to financing and funding public school construction projects to apply statewide; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Building Opportunity Act of 2020
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-628, 10-634, 10-649, 10-650, 10-658, 10-658.1 )
(   4-126, 4-126.1, 5-317, 5-322 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM