Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an innkeeper to maintain a computerized record-keeping system of all guest transactions and receipts; requiring that certain records be kept for not less than 6 months from the date of the creation of the record; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services and the Maryland Department of Labor to approve an educational training program and a refresher training program for identification and reporting of suspected human trafficking; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0876
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0382 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/24/2020
Legislative Date
9/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/24/2020 9/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records and Human Trafficking Awareness Training
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/9/2021 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page