Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Health and Safety of Students - Notification of Problematic Student Behavior
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public schools and nonpublic schools that receive State funds to notify parents or guardians of all students involved in an incident of problematic sexual behavior by the close of business on the day of the incident; and requiring a county board to ensure that certain schools have a certain policy in place regarding a certain notification.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1005 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Health and Safety of Students - Notification of Problematic Student Behavior
(   7-424.4 )
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:44 PM
Click to return on the top page