Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Corderman, Cox, M. Fisher, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Parrott, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 55 years old to 50 years old, the age at which a resident is eligible for a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for retirement income attributable to certain employment; altering the amount of certain retirement income that may be included under a certain subtraction modification; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 8:10 AM