Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Outdoor Musical Festival Promoter License - Repeal of Safety Permit Requirement
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Police)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that an applicant for a promoter license to act as a promoter of outdoor musical festivals obtain a specified safety permit from the Secretary of State Police; requiring a specified approval by a local law enforcement unit of an applicant for a promoter license to be based on specified safety- and security-related criteria; and repealing the authority of the Department of State Police to charge an applicant for a promoter license a specified fee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 60A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-1404, 17-1406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM