Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Hartman, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Boyce, Buckel, Cardin, Chisholm, Clippinger, Cox, Ebersole, M. Fisher, Ghrist, Grammer, Griffith, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kerr, Kipke, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McKay, Metzgar, Miller, Otto, Patterson, Pippy, Proctor, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Valderrama, Walker, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing a life-threatening injury to another as a result of the person's driving, operating, or controlling a motor vehicle or vessel in a criminally negligent manner; exempting certain conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 18 months or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both for a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0029
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0368 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-212.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:46 PM