Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, Moon, Shetty, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to stay the entering of judgment, defer further proceedings, and place a certain defendant on probation subject to reasonable conditions if the court finds facts justifying a finding of guilt; repealing a requirement that certain written consent of the defendant to the probation before judgment occur after a determination of guilt or acceptance of a nolo contendere plea; and authorizing a court to suspend a portion or all of a certain sentence as a condition of probation before judgment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:34 PM
Click to return on the top page