Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Registered Voter List Security and Electronic Signature Requirements for Petitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Ruth
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations specifying requirements for the secure storage and use of voter data for copies of the registered voters list; requiring the State Board to adopt regulations specifying procedures for the collection of electronic signatures on petitions; authorizing certain petitions to contain the electronic signature of certain individuals; requiring electronic signatures to be electronically signed, typed, or affixed to a certain form; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0037
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Registered Voter List Security and Electronic Signature Requirements for Petitions
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page