Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Pendergrass, Bromwell, Barron, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing emergency medical services providers and law enforcement officers to report overdoses using a certain information technology platform; requiring the emergency medical services provider or law enforcement officer to make best efforts to make a certain report within 24 hours after responding to an incident; prohibiting a law enforcement agency from publicly publishing a certain address; making emergency medical services providers or law enforcement officers immune from criminal liability for making a certain report; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0309
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {226085/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {297479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {226085/1 Adopted 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {297479/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text - Chapter - Health - Reporting of Overdose Information
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-516 )
(   13-3601 through 13-3603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM