Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Beitzel, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Corderman, Cox, M. Fisher, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Parrott, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Phasing out, over 2 taxable years, a certain limitation on the amount of certain military retirement income that may be included in a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0279
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 8:10 AM