Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab and Cullison
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 182
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that each hospital or nursing facility in the State ensure that all of its health care service providers whether in the hospital, outside or in a separate nursing facility wear personal identification tag indicating in readable text the first name, nickname, last name, or full name of the individual that is commonly used in the hospital or nursing facility; specifying the form of names required to be displayed on the badge required to worn by a health care practitioner when providing certain care to a patient; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 182
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Finance 38
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 182
Text - Chapter - Hospital and Nursing Facility Workers and Health Care Practitioners - Identification Tags and Badges - Name Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-308.4 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:46 PM