Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Acevero, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Ivey, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Shetty, Smith, Stewart, Turner, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county board of education or public school from spending any money from any source to directly or indirectly provide a teacher with a firearm or train a teacher in the use of a firearm; and providing the Act does not apply to a school-approved sport or club that makes use of firearms.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0536
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-44)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Public Safety - Education - Firearm Funding
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-44) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings 42
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM