Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Sponsored by
Cecil County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions relating to a home detention program in Cecil County; authorizing the Sheriff of Cecil County to establish home detention, pretrial release, work release, and prerelease programs; requiring the Sheriff to adopt regulations necessary to implement the programs; providing that a certain condition imposed by a court supersedes a certain regulation under certain circumstances; authorizing a court to allow a certain individual to participate in a program established under the Act at a certain time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Text - Chapter - Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM