Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Korman, Queen, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement at a specified time if the person was convicted of possession of marijuana.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0949
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0268 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {122412/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {998471/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {122412/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Possession of Marijuana
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {998471/1 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM