Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Beidle, Carr, Cassilly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Glenn, Hayes, Healey, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, Jackson, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, Robinson, Rose, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, P. Young, and R. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of freight from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; establishing penalties for specified violations; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures, as specified; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to provide notice, as specified, to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {293224/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-91)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {843225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-87)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-42)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 9:00 PM (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 45
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Floor Amendment {293224/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-91) 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Floor Amendment {843225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-87) 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (98-42) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-31) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 9:00 PM (Senator Conway) Adopted 63A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM