Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a child, an individual under the age of 18 years, from knowingly sending, displaying, or publishing to another a sexually explicit or nude image depicting another child under certain circumstances; prohibiting a child from knowingly sending, displaying, or publishing to another a sexually explicit or nude image depicting only himself or herself under certain circumstances; prohibiting a child from knowingly possessing a sexually explicit or nude image depicting another child without the other child's consent; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1245 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
(   3-8D-101 through 3-8D-105 )
(   7-205.3 )
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page