Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Dumais, Anderson, Atterbeary, Cluster, Corderman, Gibson, Kittleman, J. Lewis, Malone, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Proctor, Queen, Sanchez, Sydnor, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the list of charges to which a certain prohibition against violating a certain condition of pretrial or posttrial release is applicable.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0170
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM