Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Sponsored by
Delegates Cassilly, Jalisi, Johnson, and Lisanti
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a park services associate who is not commissioned as a law enforcement officer to issue a citation for a parking violation on certain property in the State.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0024 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (38-7) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-301 )
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:08 AM