Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Cassilly, Johnson, and Lisanti
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a new or renewed authorization to catch crabs under a tidal fish license to supply, as part of the application, the applicant's home address and proof of residency.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1284 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {600216/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {600216/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM