Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the group of persons who may file a certain petition for postconviction DNA testing or a database or log search; requiring a court to order a new trial or vacate a conviction under certain circumstances for certain classes of persons filing for postconviction DNA testing; establishing a standard required to file a writ of actual innocence by a person convicted as a result of a guilty plea, an Alford plea, or a plea of nolo contendere; authorizing a court to order a new trial or vacate a certain conviction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {332915/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-5)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {332915/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Postconviction - DNA Testing and Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-5) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48C
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {898772/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-201, 8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM