Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening for Developmental Disabilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Cain, Forbes, Hettleman, Kerr, Metzgar, Palakovich Carr, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning July 1, 2021, certain child care centers to offer early childhood screening for developmental disabilities for each child under the age of 3 years in the child care center in a certain manner; requiring certain child care centers to have on-site an individual who has completed a certain training program approved by the State Department of Education; authorizing the Department to approve a certain training program only if the program demonstrates certain best practices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening for Developmental Disabilities
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   9.5-413.1 )
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 10:15 AM