Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, Acevero, Anderson, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Bartlett, Barve, Boyce, Bromwell, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Kaiser, Kelly, Kittleman, Korman, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Qi, Reznik, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, C. Watson, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making certain requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a certain request to be made in a certain manner; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet certain requirements; establishing certain requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a certain form; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0311
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {816189/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/06 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (74-66)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {816189/1 Adopted 39
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/06 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 39
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (74-66) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103 )
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-16 )
(   27-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM