Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing a forestry camp and a training school from a certain list of placements; prohibiting a child who is a juvenile placed in the custody of certain entities from being disenrolled from public school until the disposition of the child's juvenile case; requiring the public school in which the child is enrolled to provide the State Department of Education with certain educational materials; requiring the Department, in consultation with county boards of education, to develop and implement a certain procedure; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1188 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/19/2020
Legislative Date
6/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/19/2020 6/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 10:04 AM
Click to return on the top page