Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual who hunts under a Deer Management Permit in Harford County to use a shotgun or a breech loading center fired rifle to hunt deer throughout the year, including all deer hunting seasons, in the locations and under the conditions set forth in the permit; and authorizing an individual who hunts under a Deer Management Permit in Harford County to hunt deer on certain lands under certain conditions.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0923
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM